Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02841
Date Filed2022-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning the discovery of a gun belonging to Hunter Biden in a dumpster in Delaware in October 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that it had conducted a search and located responsive records. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9530478) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 9/20/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-294STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 29, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/26/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-146NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-207ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-20MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 20, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-11-108Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
2022-11-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 13, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 14, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar