Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2022cv11532
Date Filed2022-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Denise J. Casper
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Massachusetts submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, and the National Security Agency for records concerning former President Donald Trump's alleged order automatically declassifying records that he took to Mar-a-Lago. The ACLU of Massachusetts also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt and one agency indicated that it could find no records. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, the ACLU of Massachusetts filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
DefendantNational Security Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9502609 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Category Sheet)(Panariello, Natalie) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-192ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-193Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Department of Defense. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-204NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie F. Panariello on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (Panariello, Natalie) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-225NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-276SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. Central Intelligence Agency served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/20/2022; National Security Agency served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/20/2022; Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/20/2022; United States Department of Defense served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Returned Executed)(Panariello, Natalie) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-10-187NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Department of Defense (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-218NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Heiman on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Department of Defense (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-219ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-2410NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 (Remote only) before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2411Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2412Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Video Conference(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-11-2113CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-2114JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Panariello, Natalie) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-2115CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-2816NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Escobedo Hart on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (Hart, Christopher) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-2817NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-2818Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2022 by video conference. Government to file its motion for summary judgment, including any Vaughn index by 1/16/23. Plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion to be filed by 2/6/23. Government's reply and any cross-opposition to be filed by 2/23/23. Plaintiff's cross-reply to be filed by 2/27/23. Hearing set for 3/28/23 at 2:00PM. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Daniel McFadden, Matthew Segal and Natalie Panariello for the plaintiff. Julia Heiman for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-2919ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 (In person only) before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar