Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBarrack v. United States Department of Treasury
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2022cv02430
Date Filed2022-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter
PlaintiffThomas J. Barrack, Jr.
Case DescriptionThomas Barrack submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury for records concerning himself held by FinCen. Barrack also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Barrack filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-201COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act against United States Department of Treasury (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8666393)Attorney Jason R. Dunn added to party Thomas J. Barrack, Jr(pty:pla), filed by Thomas J. Barrack, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- First Request, # 2 Exhibit 2- Second Request, # 3 Exhibit 3- Response 7-8-22, # 4 Exhibit 4- Email Response 7-8-22, # 5 Exhibit 5- Third Request, # 6 Summons To the Attorney General, # 7 Summons To the Dept. of Treasury, # 8 Summons To the US Attorney- Colorado, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunn, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-202Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-203SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-204ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on September 20, 2022. Consent Form due by 12/2/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/9/2022 Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (csarr, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-215NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph C. Haupt on behalf of Thomas J. Barrack, JrAttorney Joseph C. Haupt added to party Thomas J. Barrack, Jr(pty:pla) (Haupt, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-10-316STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United States Department of Treasury. United States Department of Treasury answer due 11/16/2022. (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-11-167MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Department of Treasury. (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-12-028STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Thomas J. Barrack, Jr. (Dunn, Jason) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar