Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAYERS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02852
Date Filed2022-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffHOLLY C. AYERS
Case DescriptionHolly Ayers, an investigator for the Federal Public Defender's Office for the Northern District of Florida, submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning the murder conviction of Gary Hilton, who was being represented on appeal by the Public Defender's Office. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and disclosed some records and withheld others. Ayers filed an administrative appeal of those withholdings but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ayers filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-201CIVIL COVER SHEET by HOLLY C. AYERS filed by Holly Courtney Ayers.(Ottervanger, Kara) Modified on 9/20/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-202COMPLAINT Holly C. Ayers against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by Holly Courtney Ayers. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits)(Ottervanger, Kara) Modified on 9/20/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-203MOTION to WAIVE FILING FEE by HOLLY C. AYERS. (Ottervanger, Kara) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Complaint; emailed to kara_ottervanger@fd.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In Forma Pauperis Request e-filed without leave of court. In the future, do not file these kinds of cases electronically. (znmg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/20/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-10-134ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/13/2022. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
2022-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
2022-10-275STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/27/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-10-276SUMMONS (4) Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; sent to U.S. Marshals Service. (zcb, ) Modified on 10/27/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/31/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/31/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/31/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2022. (zjm) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-288NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-289Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, with proposed order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion for extension of time to file their answer, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before January 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/29/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar