Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALFORD v. MCDOUNGH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02856
Date Filed2022-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffLEROY ALFORD
Case DescriptionLeroy Alford submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the appeal of his disability claim. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Alford filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDENIS MCDOUNGH Sect'y Dept of Veterans Affairs, Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-201COMPLAINT against DENIS MCDOUNGH (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number TBD) with Jury Demand filed by LEROY ALFORD. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztth) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-20SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DENIS MCDOUNGH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-11-042NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of DENIS MCDOUNGH (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-043First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Opposed) by DENIS MCDOUNGH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-074GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 7, 2022. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 3 Defendant's First Opposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond, it is hereby ORDERED that the 3 Defendant's First Opposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before December 12, 2022, the defendant shall file his answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith mail a copy of this Minute Order to the plaintiff's address on record. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 7, 2022. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 12/12/2022. (mac) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-115Memorandum in opposition to re 3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by LEROY ALFORD. (ztth) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-12-126ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DENIS MCDOUNGH. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2022-12-207AFFIDAVIT of Mailing by LEROY ALFORD. (ztth) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2023-01-19MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 16, 2023, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith mail a copy of this Minute Order to the plaintiff's address on record. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 19, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/16/2023. (mac) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-20ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Opposition To The Defendant's Motion To Dismiss due by 1/30/2023. Defendant Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss due by 2/13/2023 (mac) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar