Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUniversity of Washington et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2022cv01329
Date Filed2022-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tana Lin
PlaintiffUniversity of Washington a Washington state agency
PlaintiffThe Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington a research center created by state law
PlaintiffAngelina Godoy Director, Center for Human Rights at the University of Washington
Case DescriptionThe University of Washington's Center for Human Rights submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the human rights impact of federal immigration enforcement in the State of Washington. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, disclosed some records but withheld others either in full or in part. The Center filed administrative appeals, which were denied. The Center ultimately filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-201COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief for Violating FOIA against defendant(s) United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # AWAWDC-7709315) Attorney Daniel A Fiedler added to party Angelina Godoy(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Fiedler added to party The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Fiedler added to party University of Washington(pty:pla), filed by University of Washington, Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons ICE, # 4 Summons US Attorney's Office DC, # 5 Summons US Attorney's Office Seattle WA)(Fiedler, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-202APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas R. Burke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, University of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7709514 (Fiedler, Daniel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/21/2022) (JWC). Modified and regenerated 9/21/2022 due to signature issue (JWC). (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-213ORDER re 2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas R Burke for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, and University of Washington by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-21Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (MJV) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-214Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(MJV) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-235MINUTE ORDER: The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly recuses himself and the case is reassigned in rotation to the Honorable Tana Lin, United States District Judge. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C2:22-cv-1329 TL. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SR) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-296STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-297MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-298PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, University of Washington (Fiedler, Daniel) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-309Summons(es) Electronically Issued regarding US Attorney General as to defendant(s) All Defendants (LH) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-1110NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nickolas Bohl on behalf of Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-1111Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME , filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Noting Date 10/11/2022, (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-12NOTICE of Re-Setting Deadline re Parties' 11 Stipulated Motion. Pursuant to section II(G) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is now 11/28/2022. (LH) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-1212ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/9/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/23/2022, Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2022. (KMP) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-2513Stipulated MOTION for Relief from FRCP 26(a) and 26(f) Requirements , filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, University of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/25/2022, (Fiedler, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
2022-10-2814ORDER granting Parties' 13 Stipulated MOTION. The parties are released from the initial disclosure requirements of FRCP 26(a)(1), as well as from the conference and discovery plan requirements of FRCP 26(f). The parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 11/30/2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
2022-11-1815REVISED ORDER REGARDING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2022. (KMP) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-2816ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-3017JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 2. (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar