Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02877
Date Filed2022-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning emails sent to or from law.harvard.edu regarding Governing for Impact documents or memorandums. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Heritage Foundation's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-211COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9540882) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-11-023ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-044ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings by December 5, 2022. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 4, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar