Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMiller v. Department of Justice et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2022cv00958
Date Filed2022-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffTravis Miller
Case DescriptionTravis Miller submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Defense for records concerning Maggie Goodlander. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Miller filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantDepartment Of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-211COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16551267), filed by Travis Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Travis) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-212REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Travis Miller. (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-21Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cc3) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-21If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cc3) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-223SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Defense and Department of Justice. (cc3) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-294SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Miller. All Defendants. (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-265ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Matthew M. Mueller added to party Department Of Defense(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew M. Mueller added to party Department of Justice(pty:dft) by Department Of Defense, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar