Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHISHOLM v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02882
Date Filed2022-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffBRYANNA CHISHOLM
Case DescriptionBryanna Chisholm, a paralegal for the Federal Public Defender's Office for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the murder conviction of Charles Ray Hicks, who was being represented by the Public Defender's Office on appeal. Chisholm also requested expedited processing. The agency told Chisholm it had located 8,420 pages of potentially responsive records. The agency disclosed records in interim responses, withholding many records. Chisholm filed administrative appeals for each interim response. Chisholm ultimately filed suit.
Complaint issues: Fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Complaint attachment 41
Complaint attachment 42
Complaint attachment 43
Complaint attachment 44
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by BRYANNA CHISHOLM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Civil Cover Sheet, # 41 Summons United States Department of Justice, # 42 Summons Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 43 Summons US Attorney for District of Columbia, # 44 Summons US Attorney General)(Miller, Kelly) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-222MOTION for Waiver of Filing Fee by BRYANNA CHISHOLM. (Miller, Kelly) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-23NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to kelly_miller@fd.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-233CIVIL COVER SHEET by BRYANNA CHISHOLM re 1 Complaint,,,, filed by BRYANNA CHISHOLM. Related document: 1 Complaint,,,, filed by BRYANNA CHISHOLM.(Miller, Kelly) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-234SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-10-205NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of All Defendants (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-206Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' responsive pleading is due on or before November 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/21/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-11-107ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
2022-11-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before November 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/14/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 11/28/2022. (zgdf) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-288Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Briefing Schedule by BRYANNA CHISHOLM. (Miller, Kelly) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-28MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/28/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar