Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02883
Date Filed2022-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning discussions of the search warrant for Mar-a-Lago. Judicial Watch also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI granted expedited processing. Judicial Watch submitted a second FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning discussions with the Secret Service concerning the search warrant. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9543712) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-23NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to rcotca@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 2. Coversheet requires signature, 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-233NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-234CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re Notice of QC- New Case, 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case, 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-235SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-11-036NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Rising on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rising, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-037ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rising, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-08MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint 1 and an answer 7 . The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than December 18, 2022. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/2022. (lcsr) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
2022-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2022. (tb) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar