Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02884
Date Filed2022-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the authorization or approval of the search warrant for Mar-a-Lago. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Judicial Watch then sent two more FOIA requests to the Office of Information Policy for records concerning calendar entries or schedules for Attorney General Merrick Garland and other senior officials that mentioned the search warrant. The agency acknowledged receipt f those requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-221COMPLAINT against U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9544187) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-284STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 28, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-11-035NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Rising on behalf of U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rising, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-036ANSWER to Complaint by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rising, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-04MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 28, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 4, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/28/2022 (zjch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-287Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rising, Andrew) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 21, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 28, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar