Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUNITED FOR FBI INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02885
Date Filed2022-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffUNITED FOR FBI INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionUnited for FBI Integrity submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records regarding former FBI Associate Deputy Director Jeffrey Sallet pertaining to allegations of sexual misconduct while he was at the FBI. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, United for FBI Integrity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9544784) filed by UNITED FOR FBI INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Zummer, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-232SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-10-113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2022. (Zummer, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2022. (Zummer, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/11/2022 (Zummer, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-11-046NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-157Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-15MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint before or on November 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11-15-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-288ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-28MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11-28-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar