Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTAND TOGETHER AGAINST RACISM AND RADICALISM IN THE SERVICES, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02894
Date Filed2022-09-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffSTAND TOGETHER AGAINST RACISM AND RADICALISM IN THE SERVICES, INC.
Case DescriptionStand Together Against Racism and Radicalism in the Services submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning allegations of systemic racism and discrimination by the U.S. Air Force Academy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, STARRS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9549045) filed by STAND TOGETHER AGAINST RACISM AND RADICALISM IN THE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Peterson, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/26/2022) (znmg). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STAND TOGETHER AGAINST RACISM AND RADICALISM IN THE SERVICES, INC. (Peterson, James) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/26/2022) (znmg). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-26Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-284ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/28/2022. (DM) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-10-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/28/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/28/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/3/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/3/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-196NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-287ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
2022-10-318ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before December 2, 2022 . See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 31, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2022. (dot) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-12-029Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar