Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02899
Date Filed2022-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning communications from the Department of Labor White House Liaison and the White House pertaining to the Hatch Act and or the Executive Order on Promoting Access to Voting. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9551069) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to the Dep't of Labor, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-11-224Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-225ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR re 4 Motion for Extension of Time to. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-22MINUTE ORDER re 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Having considered the motion (along with the subsequently filed Errata 5 ), and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant is ORDERED to respond to the Complaint by December 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 22, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar