Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02900
Date Filed2022-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning communications between the agency's White House Liaison and the White House pertaining to the Hatch Act and the Executive Order on Promoting Access to Voting. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9551323) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to HUD, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-283STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/28/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-09-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-11-215NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-256Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/25/2022)
2022-11-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before December 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/26/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 11/26/2022)
2022-12-027ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-02MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before January 13, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 20, 2023, at 10:30 a.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar