Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHarp v. United States Space Force et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2022cv00972
Date Filed2022-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lee Yeakel
PlaintiffSeth Harp
Case DescriptionSeth Harp, an investigative journalist, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Space Force for records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Harp filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Space Force
DefendantDepartment of The Air Force
DefendantDepartment Of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-261MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Seth Harp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pl's Original Complaint)(Harp, Seth) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-26Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (pg) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-26If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (pg) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-262STANDING ORDER (dated 08/11/2016) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (pg) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-10-213ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-214COMPLAINT, filed by Seth Harp.(dm) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-21CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-215REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Seth Harp. (Harp, Seth) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-216DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Seth Harp: re 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. Your summons is deficient because it lists three (3) parties on each summons to be served. Please list on ONE party PER summons and resubmit your request. Additionally, please style the case number correctly at 1:22-cv-972 LY. (klw) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-277REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Seth Harp. (Amended) (Harp, Seth) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-10-278Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jv2) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-159SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney. (jv2) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar