Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMarquardt v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2022cv05538
Date Filed2022-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffShannon Marquardt
Case DescriptionShannon Marquardt filed an arbitration complaint against the Financial Industry Regulatory Authority. She then asked for records concerning the arbitration case and when the agency did not disclose them, she filed suit. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFinancial Industry Regulatory Authority
DefendantFirst Republic Securities Company, LLC
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-281COMPLAINT against Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, First Republic Securities Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 402-34611161421.). Filed byShannon Marquardt. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Envelope, # 4 receipt)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-09-282Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar