Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02948
Date Filed2022-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense and the Department of Justice for records concerning the housing provided for U.S. Capitol Police Lt. Michael Byrd at Joint Air Base Andrews after the riot at the Capitol Building on Jan. 6, 2021. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9564806) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-29Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-043SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/17/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/18/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brooke Paz)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2022 to add dates served for DOD & DOJ (zjm). (Entered: 10/28/2022)
2022-11-155Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pitz, Taylor) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-16MINUTE ORDER re 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: Having considered the motion and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendants are ORDERED to respond to the Complaint by November 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 16, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-186ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Pitz, Taylor) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-217ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings by December 21, 2022. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 21, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar