Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02952
Date Filed2022-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the most recent signed contracts for each BLM Off-Range Corral and Off-Range Pasture. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-291COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9565533) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (x3))(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-292NOTICE of Appearance by Maya L. Kane on behalf of AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN (Kane, Maya) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/30/2022) (znmg). (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Notice of Appearance; emailed to mkane@swpropertylaw.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-30Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-304NOTICE of Appearance by Maya L. Kane on behalf of AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN (Kane, Maya) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-045STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 4, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-316NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-11-157Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 16, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-228ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-30MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 6, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated dates for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 30, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar