Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA v. U.S. AIR FORCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02958
Date Filed2022-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Center to Advance Security in America submitted FOIA requests to the Air Force, the Army and the Department of Defense for records concerning the development of a Climate Action report. CASA also asked for a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Army told CASA that its request was too broad. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, CASA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. AIR FORCE
DefendantU.S. ARMY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-301COMPLAINT against U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9567124) filed by CENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAF Summons, # 3 Summons US Army Summons, # 4 Summons DOD Summons, # 5 Summons AG Summons, # 6 Summons US Atty Summons, # 7 Supplement Exhibit List, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 24, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 25)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-04Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-042SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-053STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 5, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-11-084NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Haberland, John) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
2022-11-085WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 11/17/2022.....MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Haberland, John) Modified on 11/18/2022 (zed). (Entered: 11/08/2022)
2022-11-176WITHDRAWAL of Motion by U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. ARMY . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/10/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/10/2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 14, 2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AIR FORCE served on 11/14/2022; U.S. ARMY served on 11/10/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/10/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar