Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02959
Date Filed2022-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Center to Advance Security in America submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning communications related to the SIGAR report on Afghanistan. CASA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told CASA that it would defer action of the fee waive until the request was processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CASA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9567431) filed by CENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOD Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Supplement Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 12)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-04Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-053STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 5, 2022. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-11-094NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
2022-11-095Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
2022-11-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and DIRECTING defendant to file, by December 23, 2022, any response to plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 10, 2022. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
2022-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to plaintiff's 1 Complaint due by 12/23/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/7/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/7/2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 15, 2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/9/2022 (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar