Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv02966
Date Filed2022-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.
Case DescriptionZimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. submitted three FOIA requests to the IRS for records. Its first request concerned the final appeals case memorandum prepared in connection with 3008-2009 taxable years. The agency located 63 pages, and 35 pages in full and redacted parts of 28 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). Zimmer filed an administrative appeal which was denied. Zimmer's second FOIA request asked for the Examination Division's Administrative File relating to the audit of Zimmer for 2010-2012. The agency asked for $4,756 in fees, which Zimmer paid, but it heard nothing further about the request's status. The third FOIA request asked for the administrative examination file for 2013-2015. For this request, the IRS charged Zimmer $6,068 in fees, which Zimmer paid. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Zimmer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-301COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9569089) filed by ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Reimer, Hadassah) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. (Reimer, Hadassah) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-303MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William F. Colgin, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9569159. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reimer, Hadassah) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-304MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan L. Combs, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9569205. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reimer, Hadassah) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-305MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew E. Wright, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9569231. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reimer, Hadassah) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-04Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-046SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-04MINUTE ORDER granting 3 4 & 5 Motions for Leave of William F. Colgin, Jr., Susan L. Combs, and Matthew E. Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/22. (DMK) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-187NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Colgin, Jr on behalf of ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. (Colgin, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-188NOTICE of Appearance by Susan L. Combs on behalf of ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. (Combs, Susan) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-189NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evans Wright on behalf of ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. (Wright, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-3110Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-10-3111RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2022. (Combs, Susan) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-10-3112RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2022. (Combs, Susan) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-10-31MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/31/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-11-1713RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. served on 10/11/2022 (Combs, Susan) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar