Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHaitian Bridge Alliance et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv08344
Date Filed2022-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffHaitian Bridge Alliance
PlaintiffAfrican Communities Together
PlaintiffUndocuBlack Network
Case DescriptionThe Haitian Bridge Alliance, African Communities Together andUndocublack Network submitted FOIOA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Federal Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the treatment of 15,000 migrants at Del Rio, Texas. The organizations also asked for a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Haitian Bridge Alliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantFederal Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-301COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-26754675)Document filed by Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network, African Communities Together. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B).(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-302CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-303RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by African Communities Together..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-304RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Haitian Bridge Alliance..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-305RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-306REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-307REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-308REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-309REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Prisons, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Fuzesi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-3010NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Telo Gillman on behalf of African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Gillman, Sarah) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-3011MOTION for Sara Fatima Dhanji to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26756311. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order ).(Dhanji, Sara) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-03>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 MOTION for Sara Fatima Dhanji to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26756311. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-03CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-03Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-03Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-0312ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-0313ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-0314ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Prisons. (sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-0315ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (sj) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-0316MOTION for Allison Crennen-Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26766737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit with Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Crennen-Dunlap, Allison) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-04>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Allison Crennen-Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26766737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-0517NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Wilfong on behalf of African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network..(Wilfong, Lauren) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-10-0518FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26779068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen W Manning in support of PHV).(Manning, Stephen) Modified on 10/6/2022 (aea). (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-10-06>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 18 MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26779068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
2022-10-1119MOTION for Tess Hellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26796583. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit with Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hellgren, Tess) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-1120AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/7/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Haitian Bridge Alliance; UndocuBlack Network; African Communities Together..(Dhanji, Sara) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-12>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Tess Hellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26796583. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-1421FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen W Manning, # 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing).(Manning, Stephen) Modified on 10/17/2022 (sac). (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-1422FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network. Related Document Number: 21 ..(Manning, Stephen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 10/17/2022 (sac). (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-17>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 21 MOTION for Stephen W Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sac) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-11-0223NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Walsh Kumar on behalf of Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kumar, Dana) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-0224LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dana Walsh Kumar dated 11/02/2022. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kumar, Dana) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-0325ORDER granting 11 Motion for Sara Fatima Dhanji to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-0326ORDER granting 16 Motion for Allison Crennen-Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-0327ORDER granting 19 Motion for Tess Hellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-0328ORDER: granting 24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dana Walsh Kumar dated 11/02/2022. Defendant's request for an extension of 30 days, until December 5, 2022, to file their response to the complaint is granted. SO ORDERED. Federal Bureau of Prisons answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Customs and Border Protection answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 12/5/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 12/5/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/03/2022) (ama) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-0329NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomoko Onozawa on behalf of Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-12-0430NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Sarah Decker on behalf of African Communities Together, Haitian Bridge Alliance, UndocuBlack Network.(Decker, Sarah) (Entered: 12/04/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar