Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleClayton v. Fowlerville School District et al
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2022cv12325
Date Filed2022-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Laurie J. Michelson
PlaintiffJustin T. Clayton
PlaintiffKasandra Henderson
PlaintiffJ.D.C. a Minor
Case DescriptionJustin Clayton filed suit against the Fowlerville School District. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFowlerville School District
DefendantWayne Roedel Superintendent
DefendantLivingston Educational Service Agency
DefendantRob Dorner LESA and Folwerville School District Social Worker
DefendantBobby Sue Adams Fowlerville School District Assistant Principal of Natalie Kreeger Elementary
DefendantJason Miller Fowlerville School Dristrict Principal of Natalie Kreeger Elementary
DefendantKelly Miller Fowlerville School District Coordinator of Natalie Kreeger Elementary
DefendantMike Brown Fowlerville School District President of the School Board
DefendantBrad Lusk Fowlerville School District Former Principal of High School
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-301TRANSFERRED COMPLAINT against Fowlerville School District, Wayne Roedel filed by Justin T. Clayton (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1) (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:22-cv-00690.] (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-09-302APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-09-303SUPPLEMENT re complaint 1 by plaintiff Justin T. Clayton (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (ns) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-304ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-305Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:22-cv-00690. Modified on 9/30/2022 (VLun). (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-30TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-126ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2022 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-12TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 6 Order to Show Cause on Justin T. Clayton at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-247SHOW CAUSE filed by Justin Clayton. (TTho) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-278ORDER Dismissing State FOIA Claim and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-10-27TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 8 Order Dismissing Claim and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint on Justin T. Clayton at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-109AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Justin T. Clayton against All Defendants. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-1610ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-1611ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-16TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 10 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, 11 Directing Service by the US Marshal on All Plaintiffs at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-2312SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-11-3013NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of Fowlerville School District, Wayne Roedel. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-3014NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of Fowlerville School District, Wayne Roedel. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-0115[STRICKEN] MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, motion for more definitive statement by Fowlerville School District, Wayne Roedel. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (Comstock, Travis) Modified on 12/1/2022 (EPar). (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-0116CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (EPar) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-01TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court STRIKES 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, motion for more definitive statement filed by Wayne Roedel, Fowlerville School District for failure to comply with this Court's case management requirements regarding motion practice ( see § III. A. of this Courts Case Management Requirements). Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-01TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order Striking and 16 Case Management Requirements on Justin T. Clayton at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-0217MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, motion for more definitive statement by Fowlerville School District, Wayne Roedel. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar