Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03073
Date Filed2022-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning ethics materials received by senior politic appointees of the Biden administration. PPT also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9587411) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 2022-F-05034, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Labor Solicitor)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 10/10/2022)
2022-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-133STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/13/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-11-084NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
2022-11-085Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
2022-11-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint, Dkt. 5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before December 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/8/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar