Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2022cv05964
Date Filed2022-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffNajib Aminy
Case DescriptionNajiib Aminy, a producer for Reveal, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning humanitarian parole applications by Afghan nationals from January to February 2021. Aminy also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Aminy's request for a fee waiver and expedited processing. After several rounds of clarification, the agency disclosed some responsive records but after the agency failed to respond completely, Aminy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-111COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17613856.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/11/2022) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-112Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/11/2022) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-113Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/11/2022) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-114Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2022) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-115Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-126Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-177CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/17/2022) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-198CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-11-159NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Samples (Samples, John) (Filed on 11/15/2022) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-1510CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security.. (Samples, John) (Filed on 11/15/2022) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-1511STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Samples, John) (Filed on 11/15/2022) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-1612ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 11 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Case Management Deadlines. Responsive Pleading due by 1/13/2023. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/6/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2022) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar