Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03092
Date Filed2022-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security's Office of Inspector General for records concerning its Report of Investigation resulting from a use of force incident where a border patrol agent shot and killed Claudia Gomez Gonzalez on May 2018. POGO also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted POGO's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Expedited processing

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9591657) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Dep't of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-13Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-11-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/17/2022. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/22. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/17/2022 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-167ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-168ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 14, 2022. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/16/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar