Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03102
Date Filed2022-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications from listed individuals related to protests, picketing, and parading. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Heritage Foundation contacted the Office of Information Policy concerning its request for expedited processing. OIP told the Heritage Foundation that its request had been put in the complex queue for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9594516) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Errata 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-13Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmg) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-11-143ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Snyder, Hilarie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-284MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Snyder, Hilarie) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar