Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigration Litigation Alliance et al v. US Department of State
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2022cv11734
Date Filed2022-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nathaniel M. Gorton
PlaintiffNational Immigration Litigation Alliance
PlaintiffChurch World Service
Case DescriptionThe National Immigration Litigation Alliance and Church World Services submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the staffing, processing, and adjudication of Form I-730 Refugee/Asylee Relative Petitions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. DOS told NILA that it would not be able to respond within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NILA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-131COMPLAINT against US Department of State Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9538520 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Church World Service, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, DOS email, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, FOIA acknowledgement, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, # 5 Category form)(Marzouk, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-132MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kristin Macleod-Ball, Trina Realmuto Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9538531 by Church World Service, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A Affidavit of Kristin MacLeod Ball, # 2 Exhibit Ex B Affidavit of Trina Realmuto, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Marzouk, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-133ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-134Summons Issued as to US Department of State. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-135Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kristin Macleod-Ball and Trina Realmuto. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account . Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 10/13/2022)
2022-10-146NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Realmuto on behalf of Church World Service, National Immigration Litigation Alliance (Realmuto, Trina) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-177NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Macleod-Ball on behalf of Church World Service, National Immigration Litigation Alliance (Macleod-Ball, Kristin) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-278NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of US Department of State (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-10-279AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by National Immigration Litigation Alliance, Church World Service. US Department of State served on 10/26/2022, answer due 11/16/2022. Acknowledgement filed by National Immigration Litigation Alliance; Church World Service. (Macleod-Ball, Kristin) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-2110Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, to December 16, 2022 by US Department of State.(Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-2211Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, to December 16, 2022 , 1 Complaint, US Department of State answer due 12/16/2022. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar