Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOSCOU v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03125
Date Filed2022-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJAMES MOSCOU
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9599069) filed by JAMES MOSCOU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-142SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAMES MOSCOU(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-143NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JAMES MOSCOU (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-144NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JAMES MOSCOU (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-17Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-175SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-206ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/20/2022.(DM) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-11-187Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-18MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants indicate that a heavy caseload at the U.S. Attorney's Office has led to delays and requests a 35-day extension "to discuss this matter with the relevant agency, explore whether this case may be resolved without litigation and, if not, formulate Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint." The Court GRANTS IN PART Defendants' 7 Motion as for a 21-day extension. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DECEMBER 14, 2022. Additionally, Plaintiff shall file proof of service with the Court by DECEMBER 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/18/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 12/14/2022. Plaintiff shall file proof of service with the Court by 12/14/2022. (dot) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar