Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHall v. The United States of America et al
DistrictMiddle District of Tennessee
CityNashville
Case Number3:2022cv00818
Date Filed2022-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Eli J. Richardson
PlaintiffCharles Wesley Hall
Case DescriptionCharles Hall submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning whether Josefat Alvarado had been deported. Hall was involved in an accident caused by Alvarado and his insurance company filed an insurance claim against Alvarado as an uninsured motorist. However, the court required Hall to show that Alvarado was in Tennessee illegally. Hall filed a request with USCIS, which refused to confirm Alvarado's status. Hall then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantThe United States of America
DefendantThe United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-131COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, The United States of America (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3684119), filed by Charles Wesley Hall. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-132BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Charles Wesley Hall. (ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-133NOTICE of Appearance by William Kennerly Burger on behalf of Charles Wesley Hall. (ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-184NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-185NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/28/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-18TN State Bar status verified as active for William Kennerly Burger admitted to this court . (ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-18NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 1 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (ad) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-286NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to United States of America. (Burger, William) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
2022-10-317NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (Burger, William) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-11-018Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security and The United States of America, U.S. Attorney. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad) (Entered: 11/01/2022)
2022-12-029MOTION to Continue Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference by Charles Wesley Hall. (Burger, William) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar