Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03147
Date Filed2022-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning communications by the FBI to the Secret Service pertaining to the search of Mar-a-Lago. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9602418) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-17Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-204ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/20/2022. (DM) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/20/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/19/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brooke Paz)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-176Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant indicates that their caseload has "approached or surpassed all-time monthly highs," causing delays such that "the undersigned learned just earlier today that the Department's Federal Programs Branch will be handling the defense." Defendant explains that "[t]o provide adequate time for a trial attorney in that component to discuss this matter with the relevant agency and formulate Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint, the undersigned seeks this extension." This is Defendant's first request for an extension of time in this matter and Plaintiff consents. The Court GRANTS the 6 Motion and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's complaint by no later than DECEMBER 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/17/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar