Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03151
Date Filed2022-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning seed collection contracts and verification processes for seed quality. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9602631) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for BLM, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-183SUMMONS(3)Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-11-214Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with proposed order by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-23MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/23/2022. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar