Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03152
Date Filed2022-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to National Institute of Health for records concerning the safety of vaccines to prevent COVID-19 or SARS-2. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9602655) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-11-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/27/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/26/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/3/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/2/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brooke Paz)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-285NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Coogle on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Coogle, Christine) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-286ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Coogle, Christine) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-297MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 12, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar