Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03153
Date Filed2022-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning the safety of vaccines to prevent COVID-19 and SARS-2. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Judicial Watch agreed to narrow the scope of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9602716) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
2022-10-18Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-11-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/27/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/26/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/3/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/2/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brooke Paz)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-225NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-226Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by December 28, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/22/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/28/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-12-287MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
2023-01-058Memorandum in opposition to re 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Marshall (with Exhibit), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)
2023-01-129REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/12/2023)
2023-01-1910ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and (2) Defendant shall file its Answer by February 2, 2023. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-1911MEMORANDUM OPINION re. 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/2/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar