Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA v. TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03178
Date Filed2022-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffCONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Constitutional Law Center for Muslims in America submitted a FOIA request to the Terrorist Screening Center for records concerning its policies, practices, and role in the terrorist watchlist system. The agency acknowledged receiving CLCMA's certified letter, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CLCMA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantTERRORIST SCREENING CENTER
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-181COMPLAINT against TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9607503) filed by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-182MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samira S. Elhosary, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9607568. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-19NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to cjump@clcma.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-193CIVIL COVER SHEET by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA re Notice of QC- New Case,, 1 Complaint, filed by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,, 1 Complaint, filed by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA.(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-194SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Samira S. Elhosary is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 21, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-11-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2022. (Jump, Christina) (Entered: 11/01/2022)
2022-11-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/22. (Jump, Christina) (Entered: 11/01/2022)
2022-11-017NOTICE of Appearance by Samira Elhosary on behalf of CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA (Elhosary, Samira) (Entered: 11/01/2022)
2022-11-188NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-189Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-18MINUTE ORDER re 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Having considered the motion and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant is ORDERED to respond to the Complaint by December 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 18, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar