Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03184
Date Filed2022-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning allegations that Customs and Border Protection agents whipped migrants that were to enter the U.S. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Heritage Foundation's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9607878) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Related Case Form- Criminal, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-182NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. Case related to Case No. 22-cv-1770. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmrl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-254STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 25, 2022. (lccnj2) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/26/2022) (zcal). (Entered: 10/25/2022)
2022-11-185MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with Partial Consent by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-216Memorandum in opposition to re 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Samuel Everett Dewey, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Dewey Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Dewey Decl., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Dewey Decl.)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar