Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Military Religious Freedom Foundation. (Ward, Vincent) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2022-10-18 | 2 | Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8513319 re 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Military Religious Freedom Foundation. (Ward, Vincent) filed by Military Religious Freedom Foundation. (cmm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2022-10-19 | | United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg) (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2022-10-19 | 3 | PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2022-10-19 | 4 | FILED IN ERROR-PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) Modified on 10/20/2022 (dr). (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2023-01-18 | 5 | ORDER TO CURE OR SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. By 2/1/2023, Plaintiff shall: (1) file proof of service of process on Defendant in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4; or, (2) show cause why its claims should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely accomplish such service. (kmt) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 6 | PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 7 | ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |