Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWarren v. United States of America
DistrictSouthern District of Georgia
CitySavannah
Case Number4:2022cv00243
Date Filed2022-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William T. Moore, Jr
PlaintiffJoseph P. Warren
Case DescriptionJoseph Warren submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning examination communications with the IRS for tax years 2006 to 2012. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for additional time in which to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Warren filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Of America Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-191COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Joseph P. Warren. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (gmh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2022: # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh). (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-19Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3448859. (gmh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-202RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/20/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Litigants Bill of Rights) (gmh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-20Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. CLICK HERE TO READ . (gmh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-203Litigants' Bill of Rights by Joseph P. Warren. (Williamson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-244NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 11/7/2022. (thb) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-245Litigants' Bill of Rights by Joseph P. Warren. (Williamson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-11-046Summons Submitted (Williamson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-047Summons Submitted (Williamson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-048Summons Submitted (Williamson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-049Summons Issued as to United States of America. (slt) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-12-0910NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Steven Schifano on behalf of United States Of America (Schifano, Larry) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
2022-12-0911MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by United States Of America. Responses due by 12/23/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schifano, Larry) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
2022-12-12MOTIONS REFERRED: 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (thb) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2022-12-1212NOTICE by United States Of America of Consent by Plaintiff to Defendant's 11 Motion for Order Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Schifano, Larry) Link added. Modified on 12/12/2022 (thb). (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2022-12-1313ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. United States Of America answer due 1/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/13/2022. (gmh) Modified on 12/14/2022 (gmh). (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2023-01-1114NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of United States Of America (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
2023-01-1116ANSWER to Complaint by United States Of America.(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
2023-01-1117NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 15 Notice (Other). After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 1/25/2023. (thb) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
2023-01-1218Litigants' Bill of Rights by United States Of America. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 01/12/2023)
2023-01-2419REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 01/24/2023)
2023-01-25MOTIONS REFERRED: 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar