Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES LOCAL 704 v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03207
Date Filed2022-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES LOCAL 704
Case DescriptionThe American Federation of Government Employees, Local 704 submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the agency's telework policies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, the agency discussed the scope of the second request with AFGE and released some records. However, after failing to respond to either request, AFGE filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-201COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9611962) filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES LOCAL 704. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for EPA, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsl) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-242SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-11-173NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-174Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-18MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to respond. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by December 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/18/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar