Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03236
Date Filed2022-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionAmerican Wild Horse Campaign submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning communications of four named employees and their interactions pertaining to policies of the agency's Wild Horse & Burro program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-221COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9618259) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quaranto, Lance) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/15/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 10/22/2022)
2022-10-24Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmrl) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-242SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-11-223NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-284Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-295NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Quaranto on behalf of AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN (Quaranto, Lance) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/29/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-306ORDER: 4 Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED and the Defendant shall have through and including 12/28/2022 to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/30/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-287Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
2023-01-03MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 7 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall have through and including 1/18/2023 to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/3/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-188ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-239ORDER: Local Rule 16.3(b)(10) exempts parties to a FOIA action from typical scheduling order requirements. Instead, the government has the burden to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting dispositive motion. The Court therefore ORDERS the government to file the index and supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/23/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar