Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHELMOWSKI v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03176
Date Filed2022-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJAMES CHELMOWSKI
Case DescriptionJames Chelmowski submitted FOIA requests to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Chelmowski filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION NARA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-141COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 203272) filed by JAMES CHELMOWSKI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(zjm) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-14SUMMONS Not Issued as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (zjm) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-232ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at her address of record (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/23/2022. (lcja) (Entered: 10/23/2022)
2022-10-27SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjm) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar