Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHELMOWSKI v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENT PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03177
Date Filed2022-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJAMES CHELMOWSKI
Case DescriptionJames Chelmowski submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipts of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Chelmowski filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENT PROTECTION AGENCY EPA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENT PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 203273) filed by JAMES CHELMOWSKI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(zjm) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-14SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENT PROTECTION AGENCY (zjm) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-242STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-27SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENT PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjm) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar