Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCASA v. Wheeler et al
DistrictMiddle District of Pennsylvania
CityHarrisburg
Case Number1:2022cv01648
Date Filed2022-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Jennifer P. Wilson
PlaintiffCASA
Case DescriptionCASA, an organization advocating for the Pennsylvania immigrant and Latino community. filed a suit against York County, PA for violating the Voting Rights Act. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantJulie Wheeler In their official capacities as members of the York County Board of Elections
DefendantDoug Hoke In their official capacities as members of the York County Board of Elections
DefendantRon Smith In their official capacities as members of the York County Board of Elections
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-10-201COMPLAINT against Doug Hoke, Ron Smith, Julie Wheeler ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number BPAMDC-6092008), filed by CASA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-202Summons Issued as to Doug Hoke, Ron Smith, Julie Wheeler and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-20DOCKET ANNOTATION: SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT via email to Attys. Steiner, Schwarz, Galindo and Goldsmith. (pjr) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-203DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CASA. (Chapman, Julia) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-204SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: A telephonic status conference in scheduled for Friday, October 21, 2022, at 12:30 p.m. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the complaint and the possibility of an expedited briefing schedule on Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief. This status conference shall be conducted on the record. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/20/2022. (ve) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-205MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CASA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Chapman, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D, # 6 Exhibit(s) E, # 7 Exhibit(s) F, # 8 Exhibit(s) G, # 9 Exhibit(s) H, # 10 Exhibit(s) I, # 11 Exhibit(s) J, # 12 Exhibit(s) K, # 13 Exhibit(s) L, # 14 Declaration Walther-Rodriguez, # 15 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Julia) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-206MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CASA re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Chapman, Julia) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-10-217PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of CASA Attorney Ghita Schwarz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6094270.. (Schwarz, Ghita) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-218PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Julia E Chapman on behalf of CASA Attorney Neil Steiner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6094359.. (Chapman, Julia) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-21DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar Status checked Attorneys Schwarz and Steiner, in good standing. (pjr) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-21DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 9 deleted - clerical error. (pjr) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-2110ORDER - IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1) Defendants may file a brief in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, Doc. 5, by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, October 26, 2022. 2) Plaintiff may file a reply brief in support of its motion for preliminary injunction, Doc. 5, by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 27, 2022. 3) Oral argument on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, Doc. 5, is scheduled for Friday, October 28, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1, Ninth Floor, Federal Building, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/21/2022. (ve) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-2111PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Rayza Bayla Bray Goldsmith on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Rayza Goldsmith is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6094938.. (Goldsmith, Rayza) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-21DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar Status checked Attorney Rayza Goldsmith, in good standing (pjr) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-2112SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Neil Steiner, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/21/2022. (ve) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2113SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ghita Schwarz, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/21/2022. (ve) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2114SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Rayza Bayla Bray Goldsmith, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/21/2022. (ve) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2515NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Freedman on behalf of Doug Hoke, Ron Smith, Julie Wheeler (Freedman, David) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
2022-10-2616ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Doug Hoke, Ron Smith, Julie Wheeler.(Freedman, David) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
2022-10-2617BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Doug Hoke, Ron Smith, Julie Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 12, # 12 Exhibit(s) 13, # 13 Exhibit(s) 14)(Freedman, David) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
2022-10-2718VERBAL ORDER - AND NOW, on this 27th day of October, 2022, upon review of a joint request from counsel, IT IS ORDERED THAT the court will stay the reply brief deadline and cancel the oral argument scheduled for October 28, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. The court FURTHER ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report by no later than Wednesday, November 2, 2022, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/27/2022. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (ve) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-0219Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CASA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Julia) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-0320ORDER - IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:1) The joint motion to stay proceedings, Doc. 19, is GRANTED.2) Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, Doc. 5, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiff to renew that motion based on the allegation that Defendants have violated paragraph 1 of the agreement in the parties joint motion for stay of proceedings, Doc. 19.3) A joint status report shall be filed by December 15, 2022.4) A telephonic status conference is scheduled for January 4, 2023, at 11:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call once all parties are on the line to chambers at 717-221-3970. The parties should be prepared to discuss the joint status report, as well as future proceedings related to the complaint in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/3/2022 (ve) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar