Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9631302) filed by CHRISTOPHER DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons DOD, # 4 Summons Dept of Navy, # 5 Summons DCSA, # 6 Summons Greene, # 7 Summons Paparo, # 8 Summons Wallace, # 9 Summons Lovell-Parker, # 10 Summons DC Att, # 11 Summons Att Gen)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 10/27/2022) |
2022-10-31 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to brett@nationalsecuritylawfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022) |
2022-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER : As Plaintiff has failed to correct the errors in his Complaint noted by the Clerk's Office, the Court ORDERS that he shall do so by November 4, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. So ORDERED, by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/2/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 11/02/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 2 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....CIVIL COVER SHEET by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK re 1 Complaint, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK.(O'Brien, Brett) Modified on 11/3/2022 (zsl). (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Cover Sheet; emailed to brett@nationalsecuritylawfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer. Please refile using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 3 | CIVIL COVER SHEET CORRECTED by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK re 1 Complaint, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK.(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsl) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 4 | SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 5 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/4/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-21 | 6 | Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction DEFENDANTS by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2022-11-21 | 7 | ORDER re 6 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/21/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2022-11-29 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-29 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants' responsive pleading shall be due on or before February 3, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/29/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' responsive pleading due by 2/3/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2023-01-26 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-27 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their Answer on or before February 17, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/27/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/17/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 11 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 12 | RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | | MINUTE ORDER denying the 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. This is the Government's third request for an extension and it violates Paragraph 9(A) of this Court's Standing Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/17/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 13 | MOTION to Dismiss by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 14 | STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 2/23/2023.....MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Brett) Modified on 2/24/2023 (hmc). (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 15 | MOTION to Withdraw motion re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (O'Brien, Brett) Modified event on 2/28/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 16 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time to Serve Defendants by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-23 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING the 15 Motion to Withdraw Motion. The Clerk shall strike 14 Motion for Extension of Time from the docket. Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall have until March 8, 2023, to perfect service of the Defendants, and Plaintiff shall file his response to the Government's 13 Motion to Dismiss on or before March 8, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/23/2023. (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 17 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/01/2023. (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 18 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/1/2023. (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 19 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY served on 3/7/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 20 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER served on 3/7/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 21 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAMUEL J. PAPARO served on 3/7/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 22 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DUSTIN WALLACE served on 3/7/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 23 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 2/27/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 24 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 2/27/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 25 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOY F. GREENE served on 3/7/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 26 | Memorandum in opposition to re 13 Motion to Dismiss, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 27 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 28 | ERRATA by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE re 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 29 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (O'Brien, Brett) Modified on 3/10/2023 (zed). (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 30 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Brett) Modified on 3/10/2023 (zed). (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-10 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 26 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to brett@nationalsecuritylawfirm.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as ins (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-10 | | NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 29 Memorandum in Opposition, 30 Supplemental Memorandum,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect format (Letter)- correspondence is not permitted (LCvR 5.1(a)). Please refile. (zed) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 31 | Memorandum in opposition to re 13 Motion to Dismiss, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-10 | | MINUTE ORDER granting in part the 27 28 Motion for Extension of Time. The Government shall file its Reply on or before March 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/10/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's reply due by 3/22/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 32 | RESPONSE re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHRISTOPHER L. DERYCK. (Attachments: # 1 Errata, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 33 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brian J. Levy on behalf of DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE Substituting for attorney Dedra S. Curteman (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 34 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEFENSE COUNTERINTELLIGENCE AND SECURITY AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JOY F. GREENE, DARLENE A. LOVELLE-PARKER, SAMUEL J. PAPARO, DUSTIN WALLACE. (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 35 | MEMORANDUM ORDER re Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/8/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |