Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRickner PLLC v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv09943
Date Filed2022-11-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer L. Rochon
PlaintiffRickner PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Rickner PLLC submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the death of Hakeem Campbell, who was violently assaulted while in custody at the U.S. Penitentiary in Atlanta, GA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Rickner PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [7]
Opinion/Order [17]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-221COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26994227)Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-222CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-223REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-224FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) Modified on 11/23/2022 (pc). (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-225FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) Modified on 11/23/2022 (pc). (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-11-23CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-11-23Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-11-23Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-11-23***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephanie Panousieris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-11-23***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stephanie Panousieris to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons. You can list the other addresses by placing the defendant's name on the summons followed by "C/O". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-11-236ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Prisons..(pc) (Entered: 11/23/2022)
2022-12-017ORDER This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act, Title 5, United States Code, Section 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 12/1/2022) (jca) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-018REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Prisons c/o United States Attorneys Office SDNY, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-019REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Prisons c/o NY Attorney General's Office, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-0210SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. Service was made by CERTIFIED MAIL. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-0211AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of December 1, 2022 Order of the Court (Dkt. 7) served on Federal Bureau of Prisons on 12/01/2022. Service was made by CERTIFIED MAIL. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-0212ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Prisons..(sj) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-0213ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Prisons..(sj) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-0614SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Service was made by CERTIFIED MAIL. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-0615AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of December 1, 2022 Order (Dkt. 7) served on Federal Bereau of Prisons c/o US Attorney's Office SDNY and US General's Office on 12/02/22. Service was made by CERTIFIED MAIL. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-1516JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (initial conference), adjourn answer deadline, and response to Court's December 1 order, ECF No. 7; and proposal for status report by January 20, 2023 addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Peter Aronoff dated 12/15/2022. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/15/2022)
2022-12-1617ORDER granting 16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The request is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is adjourned without date. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall update the Court as to the status of this case, and propose next steps in this litigation, no later than January 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 12/15/2022) (tg) (Entered: 12/16/2022)
2023-01-2018STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Rickner PLLC..(Panousieris, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar