Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEast Coast Metal Structures Corp. v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2022cv02664
Date Filed2022-11-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steven D. Merryday
PlaintiffEast Coast Metal Structures Corp. a Florida Corporation
DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-211COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20223290) filed by East Coast Metal Structures Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Proposed Summons)(Rodriguez, Jose) Modified text on 11/21/2022 (KME). (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-212NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-2664-SDM-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-213SUMMONS issued as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (KME) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-12-014RETURN of service executed on 11/28/2022 by East Coast Metal Structures Corp. as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Rodriguez, Jose) Modified text on 12/1/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-015NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by East Coast Metal Structures Corp. Related case(s): Yes (Rodriguez, Jose) Modified text on 12/1/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-016CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by East Coast Metal Structures Corp. (Rodriguez, Jose) Modified text on 12/1/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-197ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 12/19/2022)
2022-12-208NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-209CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2023-01-0910REPLY to affirmative defenses by East Coast Metal Structures Corp.. (Rodriguez, Jose) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar