Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03581
Date Filed2022-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Commerce for records concerning emails and letters sent to or from certain specific agency officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9695729) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A & B, # 3 Summons to US Attorney, # 4 Summons to Dept of Commerce, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-29Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zcb) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2023-01-064ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-01-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before February 9, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/11/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar