Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC. v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03583
Date Filed2022-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC.
PlaintiffGLENDA P. CROOKES
Case DescriptionThe Judge Rotenberg Educational Center submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning its 2016 request to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, JREC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-281COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. Food and Drug Administration ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9696050) filed by The Judge Rotenburg Educational Center, Inc., Glenda P. Crookes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Notice of Related Case, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Longosz, Edward) (zcb). (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-282NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:17-CV-2092-BAH. (zcb) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-283LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC. (zcb) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to elongosz@eckertseamans.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (Briggs, Charles) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-294REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC., GLENDA P. CROOKES. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC., GLENDA P. CROOKES.(Longosz, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-30Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-305SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-306STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 30, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-237NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-238Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-279ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by GLENDA P. CROOKES, JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 1B, # 4 Exhibit 1C, # 5 Exhibit 1D, # 6 Exhibit 1E, # 7 Exhibit 1F)(Longosz, Edward) Modified on 12/29/2022 (zed). (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and DIRECTING the government to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by February 3, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 27, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 2/3/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
2022-12-29NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 9 Notice (Other),. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Please refile using correct summons returned executed event. Select parties that have been served and enter date of delivery (not date mailed). (zed) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
2023-01-0310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 12/7/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email to USADC, # 2 Exhibit B - Return Email from USADC, # 3 Exhibit C - AG Certified Mail Request, # 4 Exhibit D - AG Return Receipt, # 5 Exhibit E - FDA Certified Mail Request, # 6 Exhibit F - FDA Return Receipt)(Longosz, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-0311RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/2/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/1/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email to USADC, # 2 Exhibit B - Return Email from USADC, # 3 Exhibit C - AG Certified Mail Request, # 4 Exhibit D - AG Return Receipt, # 5 Exhibit E - FDA Certified Mail Request, # 6 Exhibit F - FDA Return Receipt)(Longosz, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-0312RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email to USADC, # 2 Exhibit B - Return Email from USADC, # 3 Exhibit C - AG Certified Mail Request, # 4 Exhibit D - AG Return Receipt, # 5 Exhibit E - FDA Certified Mail Request, # 6 Exhibit F - FDA Return Receipt)(Longosz, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-0413MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew D. Rodgers, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9766134. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GLENDA P. CROOKES, JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Longosz, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-0414MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael P. Flammia, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9766183. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GLENDA P. CROOKES, JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Longosz, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Rodgers may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 4, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Flammia may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 4, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-1115NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Flammia on behalf of GLENDA P. CROOKES, JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC. (Flammia, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
2023-01-1116NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Rodgers on behalf of GLENDA P. CROOKES, JUDGE ROTENBERG EDUCATIONAL CENTER, INC. (Rodgers, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar