Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHETTENA v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03589
Date Filed2022-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffSETH HETTENA
Case DescriptionSeth Hettna, an investigative journalist, submitted three FOIA requests to the CIA for records concerning the concluding document for a report from the Inspector General of the CIA of non-registration of detainees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hettna filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-291COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9699206) filed by SETH HETTENA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-6, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-292NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-293NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-30Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zljn) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-275NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2023-01-116Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
2023-01-11MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must respond to the complaint by February 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/11/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar